WV HB2967 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 235, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 235, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the expedited processing of professional or trade license applications for service members, veterans, and their spouses, when the applicant is licensed, in good standing, in another jurisdiction.
Title
Expediting License Applications for active military members and veterans, and their spouses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 606) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 745) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 537) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 96) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 745) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 537) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 96) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 235, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-27 | House | To Governor 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/27/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 606) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 745) |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Weld title amendment adopted |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Committee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 537) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Weld floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Chapman amend to Weld amend rejected (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Weld floor amendment reported |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-02-10 | Senate | To Military |
2023-02-10 | Senate | To Military |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 96) |
2023-02-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-08 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2023-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-07 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-03 | House | To House Government Organization |
2023-02-03 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2023-01-24 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2023-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-24 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Government Organization |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1B | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1B | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1B | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |