WV HB2961 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2961

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to permit the commissioner to require a water supply system be equipped with a backflow prevention assembly; requiring the appropriate water utility to install the backflow prevention assembly at the meter; requiring the appropriate water utility to maintain the backflow prevention assembly; and requiring the water utility to provide information relating to maintenance and necessity for any backflow prevention assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting the commissioner to require a water supply system be equipped with a backflow prevention assembly

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 779) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 576) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 201) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-24HouseApproved by Governor 3/24/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 779)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenateMaroney Title amendment #2 adopted
2020-03-07SenateMaroney Title amendment #1 withdrawn by unanimous consent
2020-03-07SenateSenate reconsidered action (voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 576)
2020-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-07SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateReturned to calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-07SenateRemoved from calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 3/5/20
2020-03-05SenateReturned to calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateRemoved from calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-03SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-03Senate2nd reference dispensed
2020-03-03SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2020-02-18SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2020-02-18SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance
2020-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-17HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 201)
2020-02-17HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-17HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-14HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-13HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-13HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-12HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-02-06HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-02-06HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2020-01-08HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2961 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - To House Technology and Infrastructure

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1619Amended CodeCitation Text
1619aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2961&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2961%20intr.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=2961
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2961%20SUB.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=2961
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2961%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=2961
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2961%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=2961
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00201.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0576.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00779.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback