WV HB2961 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend the procedure by which a charitable gaming licensee may appeal the Tax Commissioner’s sanctions against the licensee for violations of the charitable gaming laws, by allowing the licensee to petition the Office of Tax Appeals for an administrative hearing rather than the Tax Commissioner.
Title
Relating generally to charitable bingo games and charitable raffles
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Del. Brent Boggs [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 461) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 419) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 231) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 419) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 231) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-18 | House | To Governor 4/18/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 461) |
2017-04-06 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2017-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 419) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 231) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-16 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-16 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-03-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-13 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB625 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 20 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 20 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 21 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 21 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |