WV HB2959 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to required environmental pollution controls for coal-fired power plants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financing of environmental pollution control equipment for coal-fired power plants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2021-03-19HousePlaced on House Calendar
2021-03-19HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-18HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-18HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-17HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-03-08HouseTo House Energy and Manufacturing
2021-03-08HouseIntroduced in House
2021-03-08HouseTo Energy and Manufacturing
2021-03-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2421lAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback