WV HB2958 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to repealing outdated sections of state code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to repealing outdated sections of state code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 316) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 122) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-10SenateApproved by Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-21HouseApproved by Governor 4/21/21
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/10/21
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/10/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateTo Governor 4/10/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-05SenateCompleted legislative action
2021-04-05SenateCommunicated to House
2021-04-05SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 316)
2021-04-05SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-05SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-04-02SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-02SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-04-01SenateRead 1st time
2021-04-01SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-31SenateReported do pass
2021-03-11SenateTo Government Organization
2021-03-11SenateTo Government Organization
2021-03-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-10HousePassed House (Roll No. 122)
2021-03-10HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-10HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-09HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-09HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-08HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-08HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-05HouseDo pass
2021-03-05HouseOriginating in House Government Organization

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10110Repealed CodeCitation Text
192A5Repealed CodeCitation Text
311512aRepealed CodeCitation Text
3131Repealed CodeCitation Text
31310Repealed CodeCitation Text
31311Repealed CodeCitation Text
3132Repealed CodeCitation Text
3133Repealed CodeCitation Text
3134Repealed CodeCitation Text
3135Repealed CodeCitation Text
3136Repealed CodeCitation Text
3137Repealed CodeCitation Text
3138Repealed CodeCitation Text
3139Repealed CodeCitation Text
34111Repealed CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback