WV HB2953 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - House rejected (Roll No. 331)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create the Commission on Cost-of-Living Adjustments. The bill provides for a declaration of public policy and legislative findings. The bill establishes the commission and provides for membership and authority. The bill establishes meetings for the commission. The bill provides for the commission's authority and duties. The bill establishes commission reports and recommendations. The bill provides for legislative action. The bill provides for applicability and exceptions. The bill provides for rules. The bill creates notice requirements. Finally, the bill provides for the creation and administration of the Locality Cost-of-Living Adjustment Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Commission on Cost-of-Living Adjustments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 331) (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28HouseHouse rejected (Roll No. 331)
2023-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2023-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2023-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-25HouseRead 1st time
2023-02-25HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-24HouseBy substitute, do pass
2023-01-24HouseTo House Finance
2023-01-24HouseIntroduced in House
2023-01-24HouseTo Finance
2023-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29361New CodeSee Bill Text
29362New CodeSee Bill Text
29363New CodeSee Bill Text
29364New CodeSee Bill Text
29365New CodeSee Bill Text
29366New CodeSee Bill Text
29367New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2953&year=2023&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2953%20intr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=2953
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2953%20sub.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=2953
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=860074900
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=860687688
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=860687651
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=860687708
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=860758827
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00331.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback