WV HB2941 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-06 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-06 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend the sunset date of the State Advisory Council on Postsecondary Attainment Goals.
Title
To extend the end date of the State Advisory Council on Postsecondary Attainment Goals
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Wayne Clark [R] | Del. Jimmy Willis [R] | Del. Michael Hornby [R] |
Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. Christopher Toney [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 76) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-06 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 76) |
2023-02-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-31 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-24 | House | To House Education |
2023-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-24 | House | To Education |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1D | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |