WV HB2939 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow the superintendent the ability to expand the sale of items from the post exchange to the general public.
Title
Relating to the sale of items in the State Police Academy post exchange to the public
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 386) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 200) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 200) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-18 | House | To Governor 4/18/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 386) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Laid over on 1st reading 4/1/17 |
2017-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-28 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 200) |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-03-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-13 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB570 (Similar To) 2017-03-10 - To Government Organization
SB665 (Similar To) 2017-03-18 - To Government Organization
SB665 (Similar To) 2017-03-18 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2E | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 10 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |