WV HB2936 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2936
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to eliminate master contracts or other statewide contracts that agencies must currently use to purchase certain commodities. Spending units must purchase commodities, printing and services at the lowest retail price for the spending unit's desired level of quality within a reasonable geographical market area.
Title
Requiring purchases to be made at lowest retail price available at level of quality sought by the spending unit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 507) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 199) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 199) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 507) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 199) |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-16 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-16 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-03-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-13 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2936 (Carry Over) 2017-04-08 - Senate requests House to concur
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 3 | 10e | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |