WV HB2933 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Anti-Discrimination Against Israel Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anti-Discrimination Against Israel Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 662) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 661) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 660) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 492) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 492) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 298) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-26HouseApproved by Governor 4/26/21
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateApproved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-10SenateTo Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-22HouseTo Governor 4/22/21
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-10HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-04-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-10HouseEffective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 662)
2021-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 661)
2021-04-10HouseMotion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 660)
2021-04-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-04-10SenateEffective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 492)
2021-04-10SenateMaynard Title amendment adopted
2021-04-10SenateCommittee Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2021-04-10SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 492)
2021-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-10SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-10SenateCommittee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2021-04-10SenateDeferred until foot of 3rd
2021-04-10SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-09SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-04-08SenateRead 1st time
2021-04-08SenateOn 1st reading
2021-04-07Senate2nd reference dispensed
2021-04-07SenateReported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance
2021-03-27SenateTo Government Organization
2021-03-27SenateTo Government Organization then Finance
2021-03-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 298)
2021-03-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-26HousePlaced on Special Calender
2021-03-26HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2021-03-23HousePlaced on House Calendar
2021-03-23HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-22HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-22HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-19HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-19HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-18HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-03-05HouseTo House Judiciary
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced in House
2021-03-05HouseTo Judiciary
2021-03-05HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5A363New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2933&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2933%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2933
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2933%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2933
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2933%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2933
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2933%20S%20GOV%20AMT%20_1%204-6.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2933%20S%20GOV%20AM%20_1%204-5.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2933%20SFAT%20MAYNARD%20_1%204-7.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2933%20SFA%20_1%20MAYNARD%204-7.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2933%20S%20GOV%20AMT%20_1%204-7.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00298.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-10-0492.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00660.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00661.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00662.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback