WV HB2933 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 44, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 44, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide notification to a prosecuting attorney of an offenders parole hearing and release.
Title
Providing notification to a prosecuting attorney of an offender's parole hearing and release
Sponsors
Del. Linda Phillips [D] | Del. Margaret Smith [D] | Del. Justin Marcum [D] | Del. Anthony Barill [D] |
Del. Harry White [D] | Del. Ricky Moye [D] | Del. Stephen Skinner [D] | Del. Meshea Poore [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 445) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 48) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 66) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 48) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 66) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 44, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 445) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 48) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2013-03-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 66) |
2013-03-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-20 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-19 | House | Do pass |
2013-03-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-14 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB550 (Same As) 2013-03-15 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 1C | 5c | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 12 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 12 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |