WV HB2922 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2922

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to authorize a court to require participation and successful completion of a drug court program or drug treatment program in order for a defendant, pleading or being found guilty of possession of a controlled substance, not including marijuana, or certain controlled substances containing an opioid or opiate, to qualify for a final order of discharge and dismissal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements to obtain a final order of discharge and dismissal for possession of opiates or opioids

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 214) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 114) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 12) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 8) (Y: 30 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateHouse Message received
2020-02-18HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-02-18HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 214)
2020-02-18HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-02-11SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 114)
2020-02-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-10SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-10SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-07SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-07SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-06SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-01-20SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-20SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-01-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 12)
2020-01-17HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-17HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-16HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 8)
2020-01-16HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-16HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-15HouseRead 1st time
2020-01-15HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-14HouseDo pass
2020-01-08HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2922 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60A4407aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback