WV HB2915 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public records management and preservation
Title
Relating to public records management and preservation
Sponsors
Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Larry Rowe [D] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Adam Burkhammer [R] |
Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. John Hardy [R] | Del. Doug Skaff [D] | Del. Sean Hornbuckle [D] |
Del. Shawn Fluharty [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 483) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 483) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 335) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 334) (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 483) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 335) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 334) (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 483) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 483) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/9/21 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/8/21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/7/21 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/6/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/5/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 335) |
2021-03-30 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 334) |
2021-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-04 | House | To House Finance |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-04 | House | To Finance |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB508 (Similar To) 2021-03-31 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 8 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |