WV HB2914 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To remove certain ex officio, voting members from the Archives and History Commission and update formatting
Title
To remove certain ex officio, voting members from the Archives and History Commission and update formatting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 352) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 230) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 230) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 352) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 230) |
2021-03-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-04 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-04 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 1 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |