WV HB2914 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 203, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 203, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for voluntary dissolution of resort area district. The bill establishes a procedure for a dissolution. The bill permits nominations for resort area board members be made by mail or electronic means. The bill permits property owners to make nominations. The bill provides for election of board members by plurality vote instead of by a majority vote. The bill limits the amount of assessments that may be levied against a parcel of real property. The bill establishes a procedure for assessments proposed by a board on its own initiative. The bill provides for the effect of 2015 amendments.
Title
Providing for voluntary dissolution of resort area district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 448) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 311) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 311) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 203, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 448) |
2015-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 8) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-03-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 311) |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-24 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 25 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 25 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 25 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 25 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 25 | 7a | New Code | See Bill Text |