WV HB2906 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the School Building Authority’s allocation of money
Title
Relating to the School Building Authority’s allocation of money
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 443) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 313) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 104) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 313) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 104) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-14 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/14/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 443) |
2021-04-06 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2021-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 313) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-10 | Senate | To Education |
2021-03-10 | Senate | To Education |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 104) |
2021-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-04 | House | Originating in House Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 9D | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |