WV HB2876 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is for the Legislature to find and declare the existence of a moral obligation to pay, with public moneys, each of the claims herein against specified state agencies and the State of West Virginia, by the named claimants, payable from the specified funds, and in the amounts of the awards made. A second and separate bill (either supplementary appropriation bill or a section of the budget bill) will actually appropriate the moneys herein awarded and permit payment in current fiscal year 2015 and through 2016. The totals, as to type of funds and amounts of awards in the bill, are: (1) General Revenue Funds of $ 29,594.65 (2) Special Revenue Funds of $ 747,869.92 (3) State Road Funds of $ 730,432.58
Title
Finding and declaring certain claims against the state and its agencies to be moral obligations of the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 21) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 258) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 257) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 258) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 257) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 21) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-03-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 258) |
2015-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 257) |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-20 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-20 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |