WV HB2852 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-18 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-18 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the preparation of a comprehensive annual financial report. The bill requires heads of spending units to prepare financial statements. The bill requires notice be given to the spending units. The bill establishes deadlines for the spending units. The bill requires training. The bill prescribes an administrative fine if the required reporting is not timely submitted. The bill provides for a response by the head of a spending unit. The bill provides for judicial appeal. The bill establishes deadlines for the submission of the comprehensive annual financial report.
Title
Relating to the preparation of a comprehensive annual financial report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 120) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 120) |
2017-03-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-08 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-08 | House | To Government Organization |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3055 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 2 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 2 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |