WV HB2823 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 8, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 8, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting buildings or structures utilized exclusively for agricultural purposes from the provisions of the State Building Code
Title
Exempting buildings or structures utilized exclusively for agricultural purposes from the provisions of the State Building Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 325) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 229) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 229) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 8, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-14 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/14/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 325) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 229) |
2021-03-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-10 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-10 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2021-03-02 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-02 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 11 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |