WV HB2819 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 108, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 108, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to ensure that the laws of West Virginia satisfy the accreditation standards of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC). More specifically, this bill amends the insurance code with respect to risk-based capital and captive insurance companies organized as risk retention groups.
Title
Relating to the financial oversight of entities regulated by the Insurance Commissioner
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 36) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 36) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 108, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2013-03-19 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 36) |
2013-03-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-14 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-13 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-05 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB328 (Same As) 2013-02-20 - To Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 31 | 16a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 40 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |