WV HB2817 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2817
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the reduction of the unfunded liability in the Teachers Retirement System over a 30 year period.
Title
Providing for the reduction of the unfunded liability in the teachers retirement system over a 30 year period
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/29/17 |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | Placed at foot of 2nd reading |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-07 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-07 | House | To Finance |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2817 (Carry Over) 2017-04-08 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11B | 2 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |