WV HB2808 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2808
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
baseline'>The purpose of this bill is to provide assisted outpatient treatment to individuals suffering from mental illness to prevent such individuals from decompensating to the point of likelihood to cause serious harm to self or others for safety of the public, to prevent the costs of inpatient involuntary hospitalization, and costs of incarceration due to untreated mental illness. The bill defines terms, requires legal proceedings, and provides for limitation of liability to examiners and providers.
Title
The West Virginia Assisted Outpatient Treatment Act
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Martin Atkinson [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
Del. John Shott [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 144) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 144) |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-07 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2808 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 5A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |