WV HB2807 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a reducing modification to the West Virginia adjusted gross income of a shareholder of a Subchapter S corporation engaged in banking business in this state and making the modification retroactive with respect to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019.
Title
Creating an additional modification to the West Virginia adjusted gross income of shareholders of S corporations engaged in banking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 718) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 500) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 266) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 500) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 266) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | House | To Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 718) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 500) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Finance Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | B&I Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass with amends and title amend, but first to Finance |
2019-02-23 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-23 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 266) |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-11 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-01 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB505 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 12j | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |