WV HB2796 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriation bill is to expire funds to the surplus balance of General Revenue and to supplement and increase an item of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for expenditure during the fiscal year 2021
Title
Expiring funds from the WV Board of Examiners for Registered Professional Nurses and making a supplementary appropriation to the Department of Commerce, Development Office
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Vernon Criss [R] |
Del. Charlie Reynolds [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 240) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 239) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 239) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 240) |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 239) |
2021-03-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-01 | House | To House Finance |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-01 | House | To Finance |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed for introduction |