WV HB2795 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-06 - On 2nd reading to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-06 - On 2nd reading to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that when a party's health condition is at issue in a civil action, medical records and releases for medical information may be requested and required without court order. The bill prohibits unilateral restrictions on the receipt or use of the medical records. And, the bill provides the right to object to request for records and effect of court order relating to the use of such records.
Title
Providing that when a party's health condition is at issue in a civil action, medical records and releases for medical information may be requested and required without court order
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 359) (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 359) |
2015-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-17 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB539 (Same As) 2015-02-20 - To Judiciary