WV HB2794 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 263, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To extend the Neighborhood Investment Program Act to July 1, 2026 and to increase the allowable tax credit from $3,000,000 to $5,000,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To extend the Neighborhood Investment Program Act to July 1, 2026

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 412) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 177) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 263, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-26HouseApproved by Governor 4/26/21
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateApproved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-10SenateTo Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-22HouseTo Governor 4/22/21
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal
2021-04-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2021-04-09SenateCommunicated to House
2021-04-09SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 412)
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-04-07SenateRead 1st time
2021-04-07SenateOn 1st reading
2021-04-06SenateReported do pass
2021-03-18SenateTo Finance
2021-03-18SenateTo Finance
2021-03-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 177)
2021-03-17HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-17HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-16HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-15HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-15HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-12HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-03-01HouseTo House Finance
2021-03-01HouseIntroduced in House
2021-03-01HouseTo Finance
2021-03-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB446 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - To Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1113J12Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback