WV HB2794 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require proof of mailing of notices to debtors that consumers are represented by legal counsel.
Title
Relating to the means of giving notice to a debt collector of a consumer’s representation by legal counsel
Sponsors
Del. Cindy Frich [R] | Del. Jill Upson [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Brad White [R] |
Del. Justin Marcum [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 222) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 222) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-03-06 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-06 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | 2 | 128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |