WV HB2793 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 278, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 278, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permit out of state residents to obtain West Virginia concealed carry permits
Title
Permit out of state residents to obtain West Virginia concealed carry permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 505) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 348) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 348) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 278, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/9/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/9/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/9/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-08 | House | To Governor 4/8/21 |
2021-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/8/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | To Governor 4/8/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 505) |
2021-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 348) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-03-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 310) |
2021-03-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-17 | House | To House Finance |
2021-03-17 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-01 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |