WV HB2793 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to clarify that a student who is home schooled may not be classified as habitually absent. The bill requires the parent of a child who is to be home schooled to notify a county superintendent of intent to home school, not the person who provides the home schooling along with an assurance that certain subjects will be taught. The bill removes the requirement that the person who provides the home schooling instruction have a high school diploma. The bill removes the requirement that the person who provides the home schooling instruction have an outline of a plan for the home schooling instruction for the ensuing year. The bill permits a parent to administer the required nationally normed standardized test. The bill provides that a student has made acceptable academic progress if it is within or above the national average range, or if below that average then the student must show improvement from the previous year. The bill removes the requirement that a certified teacher and the parent of a home schooled child must mutually agree on an alternative academic assessment of proficiency. The bill requires home schooled students who fail to make acceptable academic progress for two consecutive years be evaluated for learning disabilities. The bill requires academic assessments be kept for three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to exemptions from mandatory school attendance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 557) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 556) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 31) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 31) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 23) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Motion to table amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 22) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 252) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 251) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-01HouseVetoed by Governor 4/1/15
2015-03-18HouseVetoed by Governor 4/1/15 - House Journal
2015-03-18SenateVetoed by Governor 4/1/15 - Senate Journal
2015-03-30HouseTo Governor 3/30/15
2015-03-18HouseTo Governor 3/30/15 - House Journal
2015-03-18SenateTo Governor 3/30/15 - Senate Journal
2015-03-14SenateHouse Message received
2015-03-14HouseCompleted legislative action
2015-03-14HouseCommunicated to Senate
2015-03-14HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 557)
2015-03-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 556)
2015-03-14HouseHouse received Senate message
2015-03-12SenateSenate requests House to concur
2015-03-12SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 31)
2015-03-12SenateFloor Title amendment adopted
2015-03-12SenateCommittee Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2015-03-12SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 31)
2015-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-12SenateCommittee amendment 2 adopted (Voice vote)
2015-03-12SenateAmendment to committee amend withdrawn by unanimous consent
2015-03-12SenateSenate reconsidered amendment to amendment (Voice vote)
2015-03-12SenateSenate reconsidered committee amendment 2 as amended (Voice vote)
2015-03-12SenateDeferred until foot of 2nd reading
2015-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-12SenateCommittee amendment 3 adopted (Voice vote)
2015-03-12SenateCommittee amendment 2 as amended adopted
2015-03-12SenateAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 23)
2015-03-12SenateMotion to table amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 22)
2015-03-12SenateCommittee Amendment 2 Reported
2015-03-12SenateCommittee amendment 1 as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2015-03-12SenateAmendment to committee amendment 1 adopted (Voice vote)
2015-03-12SenateCommittee Amendment 1 Reported
2015-03-12SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2015-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-11SenateOn 2nd reading
2015-03-10SenateRead 1st time
2015-03-10SenateImmediate consideration
2015-03-10SenateReported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
2015-03-01SenateTo Education
2015-03-01SenateTo Education
2015-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2015-03-01SenateHouse Message received
2015-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2015-02-28HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 252)
2015-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 251)
2015-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2015-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2015-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2015-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2015-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2015-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2015-02-25HouseBy substitute, do pass
2015-02-17HouseTo House Education
2015-02-17HouseIntroduced in House
2015-02-17HouseTo Education
2015-02-17HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB444 (Similar To) 2015-02-10 - To Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1881Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2793&year=2015&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2793%20intr.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=2793
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2793%20SUB.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=2793
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2793%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=2793
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00251.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00252.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/senate/03-12-0022.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/senate/03-12-0023.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/senate/03-12-0031.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00556.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00557.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback