WV HB2775 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require each high school student to complete a one- half credit course of study in personal finance as a requirement for high school graduation.
Title
Requiring each high school student to complete a full credit course of study in personal finance
Sponsors
Del. Carl Martin [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Sen. Patrick Martin [R] |
Del. John Mandt [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] | Del. Tom Bibby [R] |
Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 221) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-19 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 221) |
2020-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-14 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 7c | Amended Code | Citation Text |