WV HB2773 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a greater incentive for hiring West Virginia workers, by adjusting the amount of tax credit authorized as a percentage of qualified expenditures for purposes of calculating the West Virginia Film Industry Investment tax credit (1) by decreasing the percentage of expenditures that will qualify for tax credit on qualified projects that do not employ ten or more West Virginia residents as part of the full-time employees working on the project in West Virginia or as apprentices working in West Virginia and (2) by increasing the percentage of expenditures that will qualify for tax credit on qualified projects that do employ ten or more West Virginia residents as part of the full-time employees working on the project in West Virginia or as apprentices working in West Virginia.
Title
Relating to the West Virginia Film Industry Investment tax credit
Sponsors
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. John Overington [R] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] | Del. Stephen Skinner [D] |
Sen. Bob Ashley [R] | Del. Jill Upson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | Laid over on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-16 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB338 (Same As) 2015-01-27 - To Economic Development
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13X | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13X | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |