WV HB2770 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Including home confinement officers in definition of law-enforcement officers
Title
Including home confinement officers in definition of law-enforcement officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 624) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Suspend rules to consider amendment (Roll No. 623) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 444) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 488) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 323) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 170) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Suspend rules to consider amendment (Roll No. 623) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 444) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 488) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 323) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 170) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 624) |
2021-04-10 | House | Suspend rules to consider amendment (Roll No. 623) |
2021-04-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 444) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 488) |
2021-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 323) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-03-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 170) |
2021-03-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-16 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-16 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2021-03-16 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2021-03-16 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-25 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 29 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |