WV HB2760 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 262, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 262, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to economic development incentive tax credits
Title
Relating to economic development incentive tax credits
Sponsors
Del. Moore Capito [R] | Sen. Bennett Queen [R] | Del. Clay Riley [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] |
Del. Larry Pack [R] | Del. Kayla Young [D] | Del. John Paul Hott [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 467) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 378) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 255) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 378) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 255) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 262, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 467) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2021-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 378) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/7/21 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/6/21 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 255) |
2021-03-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-03-04 | House | To House Finance |
2021-03-04 | House | By substitute, do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-02-25 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-25 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Finance |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB447 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13Q | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13Q | 10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13Q | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13Q | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |