WV HB2754 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 234, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 234, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update rulemaking concerning pharmacy immunizations.
Title
Relating to immunizations performed in a pharmacy
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] | Del. Don Forsht [R] | Del. Scot Heckert [R] |
Del. Mickey Petitto [R] | Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 402) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 402) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 32) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 402) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 32) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 234, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-23 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 402) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 402) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-01-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-01-25 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) |
2023-01-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 32) |
2023-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-01-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-18 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 5 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |