WV HB2747 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 143, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 143, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to define the terms special, regular and emergency meetings. The bill requires state agencies to file meeting notices electronically with the Secretary of State instead of requiring publication in the State Register. The bills filing change does not materially alter the amount of advance notice given to the public as the meeting notices will be, as they now are, available for review on the Secretary of States website. The bill allows agencies more flexibility in scheduling meetings as they will not be required to meet the Secretary of States internal filing deadlines. The bill also provides rule-making authority.
Title
Relating to Open Governmental Proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 437) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 26) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 26) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 143, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - House Journal |
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 437) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 4/9/13 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-03-14 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 26) |
2013-03-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-13 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2013-03-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2013-03-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2013-03-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-27 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 9A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6 | 9A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |