WV HB2741 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2741

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Motion to take discharge motion from table rejected (Roll No. 228)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to add “sexual orientation” and “gender identity” to the categories covered by the Human Rights Act, prohibiting discrimination in employment and places of public accommodation. The bill adds “age”, “sexual orientation” and “gender identity” to the categories covered by the Fair Housing Act prohibiting discrimination in housing. The bill defines “sexual orientation” and “gender identity”.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unlawful discriminatory practices in categories covered by the Human Rights Act and the Fair Housing Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - Motion to take discharge motion from table rejected (Roll No. 228) (Y: 33 N: 60 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - Motion to take from table discharge motion rejected (Roll No. 184) (Y: 34 N: 58 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - Motion to discharge committee tabled (Roll No. 165) (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseMotion to take discharge motion from table rejected (Roll No. 228)
2020-02-13HouseMotion to take from table discharge motion rejected (Roll No. 184)
2020-02-13HouseMotion to discharge committee tabled (Roll No. 165)
2020-01-08HouseTo House Industry and Labor
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Industry and Labor then Judiciary
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2741 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - To House Industry and Labor

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51113Amended CodeCitation Text
5112Amended CodeCitation Text
5113Amended CodeCitation Text
5114Amended CodeCitation Text
5118Amended CodeCitation Text
5119Amended CodeCitation Text
511A3Amended CodeCitation Text
511A5Amended CodeCitation Text
511A6Amended CodeCitation Text
511A7Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback