WV HB2734 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reduced rates for low-income residential customers of privately owned sewer and combined water and sewer utilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reduced rates for low-income residential customers of privately owned sewer and combined water and sewer utilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 355) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 126) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/9/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/9/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/9/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-05SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-05SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-05SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 355)
2019-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-05SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-02SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-02SenateOn 1st reading
2019-03-01SenateReported do pass
2019-02-27SenateTo Finance
2019-02-27SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-13SenateTo Government Organization
2019-02-13SenateTo Government Organization then Finance
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-13SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-12HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-12HousePassed House (Roll No. 126)
2019-02-12HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-12HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-11HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-11HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-08HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-08HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-07HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-30HouseTo House Finance
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-30HouseTo Finance
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11133fAmended CodeCitation Text
1113F1Amended CodeCitation Text
1113F2Amended CodeCitation Text
1113F3Amended CodeCitation Text
112411Amended CodeCitation Text
242A5Amended CodeCitation Text
2432Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback