WV HB2733 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2733
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 275)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 275)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add “sexual orientation” and “gender identity” to the categories covered by the Human Rights Act, prohibiting discrimination in employment and places of public accommodation. The bill adds “age”, “sexual orientation” and “gender identity” to the categories covered by the Fair Housing Act prohibiting discrimination in housing. The bill defines “sexual orientation” and “gender identity”.
Title
Adding “sexual orientation” and “gender identity” to the categories covered by the Human Rights Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 275) (Y: 37 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - House - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 183) (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 129) (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 122) (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 116) (Y: 40 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - Motion to discharge committee tabled (Roll No. 88) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 183) (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 129) (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 122) (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 116) (Y: 40 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - Motion to discharge committee tabled (Roll No. 88) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 275) |
2019-02-15 | House | Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 183) |
2019-02-13 | House | Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 129) |
2019-02-12 | House | Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 122) |
2019-02-11 | House | Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 116) |
2019-02-07 | House | Motion to discharge committee tabled (Roll No. 88) |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-30 | House | To Industry and Labor then Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2733 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Motion to take from table rejected (Roll No. 275)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 11 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |