WV HB2732 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2732
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require an official declaration of war or an action to call forth the state militia by the United States Congress before members of the West Virginia National Guard may be released from state control to participate in active duty combat.
Title
Defend the Guard Act
Sponsors
Del. Pat McGeehan [R] | Del. Jim Butler [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Amanda Estep-Burton [D] |
Del. William Anderson [R] | Del. Rodney Pyles [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - Motion to discharge committee on the Judiciary rejected (Roll No. 145) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - House - Motion to discharge committee rejected (Roll No. 80) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - House - Motion to table motion to discharge bill from committee rejected (Roll No. 79) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - House - Motion to discharge committee rejected (Roll No. 80) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - House - Motion to table motion to discharge bill from committee rejected (Roll No. 79) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | House | Motion to dispense reference to the committee on the Judiciary rejected (Roll No. 145) |
2020-02-12 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Motion to discharge committee rejected (Roll No. 80) |
2020-02-04 | House | Motion to table motion to discharge bill from committee rejected (Roll No. 79) |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2732 (Carry Over) 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar