WV HB2732 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a system for public funding of election campaigns for candidates for the State Senate and House of Delegates who agree to and do abide by restrictions on campaign contributions from private sources and limits on campaign spending.
Title
West Virginia Public Campaign Financing Act
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Brown [D] | Del. John Doyle [D] | Del. John Ellem [R] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] |
Del. Barbara Hatfield [D] | Del. Charlene Marshall [D] | Del. Clif Moore [D] | Del. Daniel Poling [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | On 2nd reading to Finance | |
2011-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-09 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-09 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-09 | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance | |
2011-03-03 | To Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Passed House (Roll No. 191) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-28 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-25 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-01-21 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-21 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-21 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 12 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 13 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |