WV HB2725 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prevent the Board of Barbers and Cosmetologists from regulating the use of hair, nail, skin and other beauty products that are commonly available as retail, consumer products.
Title
Restricting the authority of the Board of Barbers and Cosmetologists to regulate the use of commonly available, retail beauty products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 69) (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-08 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 69) |
2017-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2017-02-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-27 | House | To Government Organization |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 27 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |