WV HB2722 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 232, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 232, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of class B fire-fighting foam for testing purposes if the foam contains a certain class of fluorinated organic chemicals
Title
Prohibiting the use of class B fire-fighting foam for testing purposes if the foam contains a certain class of fluorinated organic chemicals
Sponsors
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. John Kelly [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] |
Del. Evan Hansen [D] | Del. Kayla Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 511) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 346) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 346) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 127) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 346) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 346) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 127) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 232, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-14 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/14/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 511) |
2021-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate effective date (Voice) |
2021-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur in changed effective date |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 346) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 346) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 127) |
2021-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-04 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-24 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |