WV HB2721 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing electronic notice of school attendance and satisfactory progress to the Division of Motor Vehicles in lieu of requiring each student to provide a paper notice
Title
Providing electronic notice of school attendance and satisfactory progress to the Division of Motor Vehicles in lieu of requiring each student to provide a paper notice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-05 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2021-02-24 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-24 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 8 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |