WV HB2709 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 44, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 44, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the aggregate liability of a surety on a consumer protection bond under the West Virginia Fintech Regulatory Sandbox Program does not exceed the principal sum of the bond
Title
Providing that the aggregate liability of a surety on a consumer protection bond under the West Virginia Fintech Regulatory Sandbox Program does not exceed the principal sum of the bond
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 156) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 99) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 99) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 44, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/21 |
2021-03-31 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/24/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/21 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-22 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 156) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 99) |
2021-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-23 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31A | 8G | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |