WV HB2703 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to remove the cap on the amount of tax that may be refunded to a dealer of petroleum products for gallons lost due to evaporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to refunds of excise taxes collected from dealers of petroleum products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 562) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 399) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 320) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-08SenateTo Governor 3/8/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-08HouseTo Governor 3/8/19
2019-03-08HouseTo Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 562)
2019-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 399)
2019-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-06SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-05SenateOn 1st reading
2019-03-04SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2019-02-27SenateTo Finance
2019-02-27SenateTo Finance
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-27SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 320)
2019-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-22HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-22HouseImmediate consideration
2019-02-22HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-28HouseTo House Finance
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-28HouseTo Finance
2019-01-28HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
111410Amended CodeCitation Text
1114C30Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback