WV HB2701 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 187, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 187, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the Division of Rehabilitation Services to approve acceptable training programs required for low vision individuals to obtain a Class G drivers license
Title
Relating to authorizing the Division of Rehabilitation Services to approve acceptable training programs required for low vision individuals to obtain a Class G drivers license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 162) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 98) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 98) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 187, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-05 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/21 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-26 | House | To Governor 3/26/21 |
2021-03-26 | House | To Governor 3/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-23 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 162) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 98) |
2021-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-23 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB433 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 2B | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |