WV HB2694 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 277, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Create the 2nd Amendment Preservation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create the 2nd Amendment Preservation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 491) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 646) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 470) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 295) (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 277, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-27HouseApproved by Governor 4/27/21
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/27/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateApproved by Governor 4/27/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-10SenateTo Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-22HouseTo Governor 4/22/21
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateCompleted legislative action
2021-04-10SenateCommunicated to House
2021-04-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 491)
2021-04-10SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 646)
2021-04-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-04-10SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 470)
2021-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-10SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-10SenateCommittee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2021-04-10SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-09SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-04-08SenateRead 1st time
2021-04-08SenateOn 1st reading
2021-04-07SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2021-03-31SenateTo Judiciary
2021-03-31SenateReported do pass, but first to Judiciary
2021-03-27SenateTo Government Organization
2021-03-27SenateTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2021-03-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 295)
2021-03-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-26HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-26HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-26HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2021-03-26HouseOn 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
2021-03-25HouseAmendment pending
2021-03-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-24HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-24HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-23HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-02-23HouseTo House Judiciary
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-23HouseTo Judiciary
2021-02-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB353 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
617B1New CodeSee Bill Text
617B10New CodeSee Bill Text
617B2New CodeSee Bill Text
617B3New CodeSee Bill Text
617B4New CodeSee Bill Text
617B5New CodeSee Bill Text
617B6New CodeSee Bill Text
617B7New CodeSee Bill Text
617B8New CodeSee Bill Text
617B9New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2694&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2694%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2694
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2694%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2694
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2694%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2694
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2694%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2694
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2694%20HFA%20D%20JEFFRIES%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2694%20HFA%20CAPITO%203-25%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2694%20S%20JUD%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2694%20S%20JUD%20AMT%20_1%204-6.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2694%20SFAT%20_1%20TRUMP%204-10.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2694%20SFA%20TRUMP%204-9%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2694%20HFAT%20_1%20CAPITO%204-10%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2694%20S%20JUD%20AMT%20_1%204-6%20adopted.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00295.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-10-0470.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00646.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-10-0491.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback