WV HB2689 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 120, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 120, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Board of Optometry to promulgate a legislative rule relating to a Schedule of Fees.
Title
Authorizing miscellaneous Boards and Agencies to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 459) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 458) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 25) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 25) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 166) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 165) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 458) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 25) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 25) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 166) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 165) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 120, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 459) |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 458) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 25) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 25) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Effective date rejected (Roll No. 166) |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 165) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-25 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |