WV HB2667 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 34, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 34, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to increase an existing item of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for the fiscal year 2019.
Title
Supplemental appropriation to the Department of Military Affairs and Public Safety, Division of Corrections
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 398) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 398) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 227) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 226) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 398) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 227) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 226) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 34, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/13/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 398) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 398) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 227) |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 226) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-25 | House | To House Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-25 | House | To Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB425 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - To Finance