WV HB2666 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to increase existing items of appropriation in the aforesaid accounts for the designated spending units for the fiscal year 2019.
Title
Supplemental appropriation to the Department of Veterans’ Assistance
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 249) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 248) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 181) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 181) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 81) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 80) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 248) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 181) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 181) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 81) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 80) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 |
2019-03-02 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/26/19 |
2019-02-27 | House | To Governor 2/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Governor 2/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 249) |
2019-02-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 248) |
2019-02-21 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 181) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 181) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 81) |
2019-02-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 80) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-31 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-25 | House | To House Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-25 | House | To Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB446 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - To Finance